Summary: H.R.1614 — 99th Congress (1985-1986)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (03/06/1986)

(Measure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. 2143)

Food Security Improvements Act of 1986 - Amends the Agricultural Act of 1949 to authorize the Secretary of Agriculture to permit specified nonprogram crops to be planted on underplanted acreage (under an acreage limitation program) for the 1986 through 1990 crops of wheat, feed grains, rice, and upland cotton only if such production: (1) is not likely to increase price support program costs and will not adversely affect existing producers of such nonprogram crops; and (2) is necessary to provide an adequate supply of the commodity, or to encourage domestic industrial use of a commodity not year in use.

Permits, at State option, hay and grazing on such acreage if the Secretary determines they would not have an adverse economic effect.

Amends farm program yield provisions to provide that: (1) for the 1986 crop year, additional price support payments in the form of commodities shall be made available if farm payment yields are reduced by more than three percent of 1985 levels; (2) for the 1987 crop year, similar payments shall be made available if farm payment yields are reduced by more than five percent of 1985 levels; and (3) in establishing farm payment yields for 1988 and subsequent crop years, 1986 payment yields may not be reduced more than ten percent below 1985 levels.

Amends the Food Security Act of 1985 to change the title of the Special Assistant for Agricultural Trade and Food Aid to the Special Assistant for Agricultural Trade and Food Assistance. Requires the President to make such appointment by May 1, 1986. Sets minimum salary levels.

Authorizes the Secretary to use unspecified (currently specified) amounts of Commodity Credit Corporation (CCC) funds or commodities for FY 1986 through 1988 targeted export assistance.

Reduces the minimum value of agricultural commodities to be used for FY 1986 through 1988 foreign market development.

Sets forth the conditions for permitted hay and grazing on diverted wheat and feed grain acreage.

Includes within the factors making up a program crop's acreage base a specified percentage of nonprogram crop acreage (50 percent for 1986 and 1987; 35 percent for 1988; 20 percent for 1989; and zero percent for 1990).

Directs the Secretary to hold hearings and implement a marketwide milk service payment program within a specified time.

Directs the Secretary to increase milk assessments, rather than reduce milk payments, in order to meet deficit reduction requirements of the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act) during the period March 1, 1986, through September 30, 1986. Stipulates that such increases may not exceed 12 cents per hundredweight.

Amends the Commodity Credit Corporation Charter Act to authorize the CCC to export up to $30,000,000 worth of surplus commodities in order to fund research and development of nonpetroleum-fueled external combustion engines.

Amends the Food Security Act of 1985 to require the Secretary to implement the restructured food stamp quality control system six months after such studies have been reported. (Current law requires implementation two years after enactment of such Act.)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the Secretary use specified statutory authority to provide advance recourse loans to producers of wheat, feed grains, cotton, and rice.

Amends the United States Warehouse Act to permit a warehouseman to transfer agricultural products to another licensed warehouse if there is a temporary shortage of storage space in such warehouse.

Requires the Administrator of the Agency for International Development to submit a plan for African famine relief by April 15, 1986.

Requires the announcement of the FY 1986 commodity list under section 416 of the Agricultural Act of 1949 to be made by March 31, 1986.