Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 04/04/1985
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/04/1985
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/22/1985
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 04/22/1985
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 04/22/1985
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 04/22/1985
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/22/1985
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 04/29/1985
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 04/29/1985
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 04/29/1985
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 04/29/1985
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 04/29/1985
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 04/29/1985
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 04/29/1985
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 04/29/1985
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/29/1985
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 04/29/1985
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 05/06/1985
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 05/06/1985
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/06/1985
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/16/1985
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 05/16/1985
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/16/1985
Rep. Grotberg, John E. [R-IL-14] 05/16/1985
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 05/16/1985
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/19/1985
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/19/1985
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 06/19/1985
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 06/19/1985
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/19/1985
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/24/1985
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 10/15/1985
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 04/28/1986