Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 03/27/1985
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 03/27/1985
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3]* 03/27/1985
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 04/15/1985
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 04/15/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 04/15/1985
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 04/16/1985
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 04/16/1985
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 04/22/1985
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 04/23/1985
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 05/07/1985