Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 01/03/1985
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 06/03/1985
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 06/03/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/11/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 06/11/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/11/1985
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/11/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/11/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/11/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/11/1985
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/11/1985
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 06/11/1985
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 06/11/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/11/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 06/11/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/18/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/18/1985
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/18/1985
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 06/18/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/18/1985
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 06/18/1985
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 06/18/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/08/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/08/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/08/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/09/1985
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 07/09/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 07/09/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/09/1985
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 07/09/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 07/30/1985
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/30/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 07/30/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/04/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 09/04/1985
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 12/05/1985