Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 04/17/1985
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 04/17/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 04/17/1985
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 04/17/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 04/17/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 04/17/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 04/17/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 04/17/1985
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/29/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/29/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/1985
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 04/29/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 04/29/1985
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 04/29/1985
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 04/29/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/29/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/29/1985
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 04/29/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 04/29/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/29/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/29/1985
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 04/29/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 04/29/1985
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/29/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 04/29/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/29/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/29/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 04/29/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/07/1985
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 05/07/1985
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/07/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/07/1985
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/07/1985
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/07/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/07/1985
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/07/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/07/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/07/1985
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/07/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 05/07/1985
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 05/07/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/07/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/1985
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/07/1985
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 05/07/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/07/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 05/07/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/07/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/07/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/07/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 05/07/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/07/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 05/07/1985
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/21/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/21/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/21/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/21/1985
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 05/21/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 05/21/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 05/21/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/21/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/21/1985
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/21/1985
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 05/21/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/21/1985
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/21/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 05/21/1985
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/21/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/21/1985
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 05/21/1985
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 06/06/1985
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 06/06/1985
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/06/1985
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/06/1985
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 06/06/1985
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 06/06/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/06/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/06/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/06/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/06/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/06/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 06/06/1985
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 06/06/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/06/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/06/1985
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 06/06/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/06/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/06/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/13/1985
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/13/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/13/1985
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/13/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/13/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/13/1985
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/18/1985
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/18/1985
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 06/18/1985
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/18/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 06/18/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 06/18/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/09/1985
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/09/1985
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 07/09/1985
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 07/09/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/09/1985
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 07/09/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/09/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 07/09/1985
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/09/1985
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 07/09/1985
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 07/09/1985
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 07/11/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 07/11/1985
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 07/11/1985
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/11/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/11/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 07/11/1985
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 07/11/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/30/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 07/30/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 07/30/1985
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 07/30/1985
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/30/1985
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 07/30/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 07/30/1985
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 07/30/1985
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/30/1985
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 09/12/1985
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 09/12/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 09/12/1985
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 09/12/1985
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 09/12/1985
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/01/1985
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 10/01/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/01/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 10/16/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 10/16/1985
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 10/16/1985