Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 04/18/1985
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 04/18/1985
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Zschau, Edwin V. W. [R-CA-12]* 04/18/1985
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 05/09/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/09/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/09/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/09/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/09/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/09/1985
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/09/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 05/09/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 05/09/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/09/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/09/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/09/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 05/09/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 05/09/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/09/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 05/09/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/09/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 05/09/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 05/09/1985
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 05/09/1985
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 05/09/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/09/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/09/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/09/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/09/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 05/09/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/09/1985
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 05/09/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 05/15/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/15/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/15/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/15/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 05/15/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 05/15/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/20/1985
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/20/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/20/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/20/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 05/20/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/22/1985
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 05/22/1985
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/22/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/22/1985

Show cosponsors who withdrew