Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 04/24/1985
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 04/24/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 05/02/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 05/02/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/02/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/02/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/02/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/02/1985
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 05/02/1985
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 05/02/1985
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 05/02/1985
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/02/1985
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 05/09/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 05/09/1985
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/09/1985
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/09/1985
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 05/09/1985
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/09/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/09/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/09/1985
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 05/09/1985
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 05/09/1985
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 05/09/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 05/09/1985
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 05/09/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 05/09/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/09/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/09/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/09/1985
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 05/21/1985
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 05/21/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 05/21/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/21/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 05/21/1985
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/21/1985
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 05/21/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 05/21/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/21/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/21/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/21/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 05/21/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/21/1985
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/21/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/21/1985
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 05/21/1985
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 05/21/1985
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/21/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/21/1985
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/21/1985
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/04/1985
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 06/04/1985
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 06/04/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/04/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/04/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/04/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/04/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/13/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/13/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/20/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 06/20/1985
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/20/1985
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 06/20/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 06/20/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/21/1985
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/21/1985
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 06/21/1985
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/21/1985
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 06/24/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/24/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/25/1985
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/27/1985
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 06/27/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 06/27/1985
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/27/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/27/1985
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 06/27/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/27/1985
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 06/27/1985
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/27/1985
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/27/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 06/27/1985
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/27/1985
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/27/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 06/27/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/27/1985
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 06/27/1985
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/27/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/27/1985
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 07/08/1985
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 07/08/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/08/1985
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 07/08/1985
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/08/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/08/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/08/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/08/1985
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 07/08/1985
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 07/08/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 07/08/1985
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 07/08/1985
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 07/08/1985
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 07/08/1985
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/08/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 07/08/1985
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 07/08/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 07/09/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 07/09/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/09/1985
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/09/1985
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 07/09/1985
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 07/09/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 07/10/1985
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 07/10/1985
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/10/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/10/1985
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 07/10/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/10/1985
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 07/10/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 07/17/1985
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/17/1985
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/17/1985
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 07/17/1985
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 07/17/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/17/1985
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/17/1985
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/17/1985
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/17/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/17/1985
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/10/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 09/10/1985
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/10/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 09/10/1985
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/18/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/18/1985
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 09/18/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 09/26/1985
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 09/26/1985
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 09/26/1985
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/16/1985
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 10/16/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 10/16/1985
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/16/1985
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/16/1985