Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13]* 05/02/1985
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/23/1985
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 05/23/1985
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/23/1985
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 06/04/1985
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/04/1985
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 06/11/1985
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/11/1985
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 06/11/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/19/1985