Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Housing and Memorial Affairs Amendments of 1985

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to make improvements in the National Cemetery System and in the Veterans' Administration program that provides assistance to certain disabled veterans in acquiring specially adapted residences, and to express the sense of Congress with respect to the Veterans' Administration home loan origination fee.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/20/1985Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
05/15/1985Reported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 99-109.
05/02/1985Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
10/07/1986HouseCertain Provisions Included in H.R.5299.
05/22/1985SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
05/20/1985HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
05/20/1985HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
05/15/1985HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 67.
05/15/1985HouseReported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 99-109.
05/07/1985HouseOrdered to be Reported.
05/07/1985HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/02/1985HouseReferred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/02/1985HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 05/02/1985
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7]* 05/02/1985
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/02/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 05/02/1985
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 05/02/1985
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 05/02/1985
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/02/1985
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 05/02/1985
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5]* 05/02/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 05/02/1985
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 05/02/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 05/14/1985
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 05/14/1985
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1] 05/14/1985
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5] 05/14/1985
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 05/14/1985
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 05/14/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 05/14/1985
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 05/14/1985
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 05/14/1985
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/14/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/14/1985
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/14/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/14/1985
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 05/14/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/14/1985
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 05/14/1985
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/14/1985
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/14/1985
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 05/14/1985
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 05/14/1985
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/14/1985
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 05/14/1985
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/14/1985
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 05/14/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/14/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 05/14/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/14/1985

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/02/1985 Referred to
05/07/1985 Markup by
05/15/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-109
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/1985 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2344. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/02/1985)

Veterans' Housing and Memorial Affairs Amendments of 1985 - Directs the Administrator of Veterans Affairs to report to the Congress a plan to expand the national cemetery system in at least ten areas with the greatest need. Directs the Administrator to consider acquiring existing State cemeteries to meet such need. Gives contingent dates for the submission of the first such report.

Amends provisions concerning national cemeteries and memorials to require that each grave marker in a national cemetery be upright. Provides an exception for individuals requesting flat markers. Requires the Administrator, no later than January 1, 1986, to designate for each cemetery in the National Cemetery System a section for graves with upright markers and a section for graves with flat markers.

Directs the Administrator to establish a national cemetery in Merced County, California, on land which is donated by the Romero Ranch Company.

Authorizes the Administrator to assist certain disabled veterans in acquiring a residence already adapted with special features deemed necessary due to the veteran's disability.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the one-percent loan origination fee charged by the Veterans Administration (VA) to veterans obtaining a home loan guaranteed by the VA should not be increased. Directs the President to request additional appropriations if he finds that additional funding for the VA home loan guarantee program is required.