Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 05/06/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/14/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/14/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/14/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/14/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/14/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/14/1985
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/14/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/14/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/14/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/14/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/14/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/21/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 05/21/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/21/1985
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/21/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 05/21/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 05/21/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/03/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/03/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 06/03/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/04/1985
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 06/04/1985
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/04/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 06/04/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/04/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/12/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/12/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/18/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 06/18/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/18/1985
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 06/18/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 06/18/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 06/25/1985
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 06/25/1985
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/25/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 06/25/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/10/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/10/1985
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/10/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 07/23/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/05/1985
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 09/11/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 09/11/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 10/01/1985
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/04/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/18/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/17/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/15/1986
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 05/15/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 05/15/1986