Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 05/21/1985
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 05/21/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 05/21/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 05/21/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 05/21/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/21/1985
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 05/21/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 05/21/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/21/1985
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5]* 05/21/1985
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/04/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/04/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 06/04/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/04/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 06/04/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 06/04/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/04/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/04/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 06/04/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/10/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 07/10/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 07/10/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/10/1985
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/10/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/10/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/10/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/19/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 09/19/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 09/19/1985
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 09/19/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 09/19/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/19/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 12/16/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 12/16/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 12/16/1985
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 12/16/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 12/16/1985
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 01/28/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/28/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 01/28/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 01/28/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 01/28/1986
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 01/28/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 01/28/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 01/28/1986
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 08/07/1986
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 09/23/1986