Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 07/31/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/31/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 07/31/1985
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/31/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/31/1985
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/31/1985
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/31/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 11/05/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 11/05/1985
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/05/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 11/05/1985
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 11/05/1985
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 11/05/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 03/04/1986
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 03/04/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/04/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/04/1986
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/04/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/06/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/06/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 05/06/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/06/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/12/1986
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 06/19/1986