Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 05/08/1985
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 05/08/1985
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 05/22/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 05/22/1985
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 05/22/1985
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 05/22/1985
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 05/22/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 05/22/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/22/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/22/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/22/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/22/1985
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 05/22/1985
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 05/22/1985
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/22/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/22/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/22/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/22/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 05/22/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/22/1985
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 05/22/1985
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 05/22/1985
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/22/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 05/22/1985
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/22/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 05/22/1985
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/22/1985
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 05/22/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/19/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/19/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/19/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 06/19/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/19/1985
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 06/19/1985
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/19/1985
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 06/19/1985
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/19/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 06/19/1985
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/19/1985
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 06/19/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/19/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/19/1985
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 06/19/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 06/19/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 06/19/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/19/1985
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 06/19/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/19/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 06/19/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/19/1985
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/19/1985
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 06/19/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/19/1985
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 06/19/1985
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/19/1985
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/19/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 06/19/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/19/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/19/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/19/1985
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 06/19/1985
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 06/19/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/19/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/19/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/19/1985
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/19/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 07/09/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 07/09/1985
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 07/09/1985
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 07/09/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 07/09/1985
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/09/1985
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/09/1985
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 07/09/1985
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 07/09/1985
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 07/09/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 07/09/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 07/09/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/09/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 07/09/1985
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 07/09/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/09/1985
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/09/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/09/1985
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/09/1985
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 07/09/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 07/09/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 07/09/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/09/1985
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/09/1985
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 07/09/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 07/09/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/09/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 07/09/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/02/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 10/02/1985
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 10/02/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 10/02/1985
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/02/1985
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 10/02/1985
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 10/02/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 10/02/1985
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 10/02/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 10/02/1985
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 10/02/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 10/02/1985
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 10/02/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/02/1985
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 10/02/1985
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/02/1985
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 10/02/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/02/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/02/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 10/02/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 10/02/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 10/02/1985
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 10/02/1985
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 10/02/1985
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 10/02/1985
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 10/02/1985
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 10/02/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/02/1985
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 10/02/1985
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/02/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/02/1985
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/02/1985