Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Long, Cathy (Mrs. Gillis) [D-LA-8]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 05/13/1985
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 05/13/1985
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 05/13/1985
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 05/13/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/11/1985
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 06/11/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 06/11/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/11/1985
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 06/11/1985
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 06/11/1985
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/11/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/11/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 06/11/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/11/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/11/1985
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 06/11/1985
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/11/1985
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 06/11/1985
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/21/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/21/1985
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/21/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/27/1985
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 06/27/1985
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 07/24/1985
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 07/31/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 08/01/1985
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 09/04/1985