Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/23/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 05/23/1985
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 05/23/1985
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7]* 05/23/1985
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 05/23/1985
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1]* 05/23/1985
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2]* 05/23/1985
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 05/23/1985
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 05/23/1985
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 06/06/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/06/1985
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/06/1985
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/06/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/06/1985
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/06/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/06/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 06/06/1985
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 06/06/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/06/1985
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/06/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/06/1985
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 06/06/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/06/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/06/1985
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/06/1985
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 06/06/1985
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 06/06/1985
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 06/06/1985
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 06/06/1985
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 06/06/1985
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/06/1985
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/06/1985
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 06/06/1985
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 06/06/1985
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 06/06/1985
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 06/06/1985
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/06/1985
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 06/11/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/11/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/11/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/11/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/11/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 06/11/1985
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 06/11/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/1985
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 06/11/1985
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 06/18/1985
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/18/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/18/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/18/1985
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/18/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/18/1985
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 06/18/1985
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 06/18/1985
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/18/1985
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/18/1985
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 06/18/1985
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4] 06/18/1985
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 06/18/1985
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 06/18/1985
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/18/1985
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/18/1985
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7] 06/18/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/18/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/18/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/18/1985
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 06/18/1985
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/18/1985
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 06/18/1985
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 06/18/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 06/18/1985
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/18/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/19/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 06/19/1985
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/19/1985
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 06/19/1985
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/19/1985
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/19/1985
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/19/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/19/1985
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 06/19/1985
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/19/1985
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/19/1985
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 06/19/1985
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/19/1985
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 06/19/1985
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 06/19/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/19/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/19/1985
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/24/1985
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/24/1985
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/24/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/24/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 06/24/1985
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 06/24/1985
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/24/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/24/1985
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 06/24/1985
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 06/24/1985
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 06/24/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/24/1985
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 06/24/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/24/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 06/24/1985
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 06/24/1985
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 07/09/1985
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 07/09/1985
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 07/09/1985
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/09/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 07/09/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 07/09/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 07/09/1985
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 07/09/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 07/09/1985
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/09/1985
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 07/09/1985
Rep. Evans, Cooper [R-IA-3] 07/09/1985
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/09/1985
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 07/09/1985
Rep. Grotberg, John E. [R-IL-14] 07/09/1985
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 07/09/1985
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 07/09/1985
Rep. Fiedler, Bobbi [R-CA-21] 07/09/1985
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 07/09/1985
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/09/1985
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 07/09/1985
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 07/09/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/09/1985
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 07/09/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 07/09/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/09/1985
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 07/09/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/09/1985
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 07/09/1985
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 07/09/1985
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3] 07/09/1985
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/09/1985
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10] 07/09/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/09/1985
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 07/09/1985
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 07/09/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 10/16/1985
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 10/16/1985
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 10/16/1985
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 10/16/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/16/1985
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 10/16/1985
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 10/16/1985
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 10/16/1985
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/16/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 10/16/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 10/16/1985
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 10/16/1985
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 10/16/1985
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 10/16/1985
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 10/16/1985
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 10/16/1985
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 10/16/1985
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/16/1985
Rep. Moore, W. Henson [R-LA-6] 10/16/1985
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 10/16/1985
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 01/27/1986
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 01/27/1986
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 01/27/1986
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 01/27/1986
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 03/04/1986