Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 06/11/1985
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 06/18/1985
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 06/18/1985
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 06/18/1985
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 06/18/1985
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 06/27/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/10/1985
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/10/1985
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 07/25/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/25/1985
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 09/18/1985
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/18/1985
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 09/18/1985
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 10/08/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 10/08/1985
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 10/08/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/08/1985
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 10/08/1985
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 10/08/1985
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 10/08/1985
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 10/08/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/08/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 10/08/1985
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/08/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 10/08/1985
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 10/08/1985
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 10/08/1985
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 10/08/1985
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 10/08/1985
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 10/08/1985
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 10/08/1985
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 10/17/1985
Rep. Long, Cathy (Mrs. Gillis) [D-LA-8] 10/17/1985
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/17/1985
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 10/17/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 10/17/1985
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 10/17/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/28/1985
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/28/1985
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 10/28/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/28/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 10/28/1985
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/28/1985
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/28/1985
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/28/1985
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 10/28/1985
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 10/28/1985
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 11/08/1985
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 11/08/1985
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 11/08/1985
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 11/08/1985
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3] 11/08/1985
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 11/08/1985
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 11/08/1985
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 11/08/1985
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7] 11/08/1985
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 11/08/1985
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 11/08/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 11/08/1985
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 11/08/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 11/19/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 11/19/1985
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 11/19/1985
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 11/19/1985
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 11/19/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 11/19/1985
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 11/19/1985
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 11/19/1985
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 12/05/1985
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 12/05/1985
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 12/05/1985
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 12/05/1985
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/05/1985
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 12/05/1985
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 12/05/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 12/12/1985
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 12/12/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 12/12/1985
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3] 12/12/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 12/12/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 12/12/1985
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 12/12/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 12/16/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 12/18/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 12/18/1985
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/18/1985
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 12/19/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 12/19/1985
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 01/29/1986
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 01/29/1986
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 01/29/1986
Rep. Grotberg, John E. [R-IL-14] 01/29/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/05/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/06/1986
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/06/1986
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 03/05/1986
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 03/05/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 03/11/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/25/1986
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/22/1986
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/07/1986
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/17/1986