Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 06/18/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/18/1985
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 06/19/1985
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 06/19/1985
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 06/19/1985
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 06/19/1985
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/20/1985
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/20/1985
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 06/20/1985
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/20/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/20/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/25/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/25/1985
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/25/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 06/25/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/25/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/25/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 06/25/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/25/1985
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 06/26/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/26/1985
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/09/1985
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 07/09/1985
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/09/1985
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/09/1985
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 07/09/1985
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 07/11/1985
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/16/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/16/1985
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/24/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 09/04/1985
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 09/04/1985
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 09/04/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 02/05/1986

Show cosponsors who withdrew