Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 03/19/1985
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 03/19/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 03/27/1985
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 03/27/1985
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/27/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/27/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/27/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/27/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 03/27/1985
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 03/27/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/27/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 03/27/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 03/27/1985
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 03/27/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/27/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/27/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 03/27/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/27/1985
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 03/27/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 04/15/1985
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 04/15/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 04/15/1985
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 04/15/1985
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/15/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/15/1985
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 04/15/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/15/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/15/1985
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 04/15/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/15/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/15/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/15/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/15/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/15/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/15/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/15/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/15/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/15/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/15/1985
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/16/1985
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/16/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/16/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 04/16/1985
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 04/16/1985
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/16/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/16/1985
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 04/16/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 04/22/1985
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 04/22/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/22/1985
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/22/1985
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/22/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/22/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/22/1985
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/22/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/22/1985
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/22/1985
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 04/22/1985
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 04/22/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/22/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 04/22/1985
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 04/29/1985
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/29/1985
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 04/29/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/29/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/29/1985
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 04/29/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/07/1985
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/07/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 05/07/1985
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/07/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/07/1985
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/07/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/07/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/07/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/07/1985
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/07/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 05/07/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/14/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 05/14/1985
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/14/1985
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/14/1985
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 05/14/1985
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 05/14/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 05/14/1985
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/16/1985
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 05/21/1985
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 05/21/1985
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/21/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 05/21/1985
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/23/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/23/1985
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 05/23/1985
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 06/04/1985
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/04/1985
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/04/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 06/04/1985
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 06/04/1985
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 06/04/1985
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/04/1985
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/04/1985
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/04/1985
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12] 06/05/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 06/05/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 06/06/1985
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 06/17/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 06/17/1985
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 06/17/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/17/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 06/17/1985
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 06/17/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/24/1985
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/24/1985
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/24/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/09/1985
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/09/1985
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 07/16/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/16/1985
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 08/01/1985
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/12/1985
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/26/1985

Show cosponsors who withdrew