Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 07/10/1985
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 07/10/1985
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 07/10/1985
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 07/31/1985
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 07/31/1985
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 07/31/1985
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 07/31/1985
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 07/31/1985
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 07/31/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 09/19/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 09/19/1985
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 09/19/1985
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 09/19/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 09/19/1985
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 09/19/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 09/19/1985
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 10/08/1985
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 10/08/1985
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/08/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/08/1985
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 10/08/1985
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 10/08/1985
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 10/08/1985
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 10/16/1985
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/16/1985
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 10/16/1985
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 10/16/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/16/1985
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/16/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 10/16/1985
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/29/1985
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 10/29/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 10/29/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 10/29/1985
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 10/29/1985
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 10/29/1985
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/29/1985
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 10/29/1985
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/29/1985
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 10/29/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 11/01/1985
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 11/01/1985
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/01/1985
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 11/01/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 11/01/1985
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/01/1985
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 11/06/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 11/06/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 11/06/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 11/06/1985
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 11/06/1985
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 11/06/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 11/12/1985
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 11/12/1985
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 11/12/1985
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 11/12/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 11/12/1985
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 11/12/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 11/14/1985
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 11/14/1985
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 11/14/1985
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 11/14/1985
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/14/1985
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 11/14/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 11/14/1985
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 11/14/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 11/19/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 11/19/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 11/19/1985
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 11/19/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 11/19/1985
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 11/19/1985
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 11/19/1985
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 11/19/1985
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 11/19/1985
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 11/19/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 12/03/1985
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 12/03/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 12/03/1985
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 12/03/1985
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 12/03/1985
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 12/03/1985
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 12/03/1985
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 12/03/1985
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 12/09/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 12/09/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 12/09/1985
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 12/09/1985
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 12/09/1985
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 12/09/1985
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/16/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 12/16/1985
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 12/16/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 12/16/1985
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 12/16/1985
Rep. Eckert, Fred J. [R-NY-30] 12/16/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 12/16/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 12/16/1985
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 12/16/1985
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 12/16/1985
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 12/16/1985
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 12/16/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 12/18/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 12/18/1985
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 12/18/1985
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 02/04/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 02/04/1986
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/04/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/04/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 02/04/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 02/04/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/04/1986
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 02/04/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/04/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 02/04/1986
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/04/1986
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 02/04/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 02/04/1986
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 02/04/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 02/04/1986
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 02/25/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/25/1986
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/25/1986
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 02/25/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/25/1986
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 02/25/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/25/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 02/25/1986
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 02/25/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 02/25/1986
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/25/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/03/1986
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 03/03/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 03/03/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/03/1986
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 03/21/1986
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4] 03/21/1986
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/21/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/21/1986
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 03/21/1986
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 04/28/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/28/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 04/28/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 04/28/1986
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 05/07/1986
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 05/07/1986
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 05/07/1986
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 05/07/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/07/1986
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 05/22/1986
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/22/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/22/1986
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 08/13/1986
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/13/1986
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 08/13/1986
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 08/13/1986
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 08/13/1986
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 08/13/1986