Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 07/10/1985
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 07/10/1985
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 07/10/1985
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 07/10/1985
Rep. Zschau, Edwin V. W. [R-CA-12]* 07/10/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 07/10/1985
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/23/1985
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 07/23/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/23/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 07/23/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 07/23/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/23/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 07/23/1985
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 07/23/1985
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 07/23/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 07/23/1985
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/23/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 08/01/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 08/01/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 08/01/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 08/01/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 08/01/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 08/01/1985
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 08/01/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 09/11/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/11/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 09/11/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/11/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 09/11/1985
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 09/11/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 09/11/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/11/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/11/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/11/1985
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 10/02/1985
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 10/02/1985
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/02/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 10/02/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/02/1985
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 10/02/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 10/29/1985
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 10/29/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 10/29/1985
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 10/29/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 10/29/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/29/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 12/05/1985
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 12/05/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 12/05/1985
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 12/05/1985
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 12/10/1985
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 12/10/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 12/11/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/04/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 02/19/1986