Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 07/16/1985
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/24/1985
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 07/24/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/24/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/24/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/24/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 07/24/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 07/24/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 07/24/1985
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/24/1985
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/24/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 07/24/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 07/24/1985
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 07/24/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 07/24/1985
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 07/24/1985
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 07/24/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/24/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/24/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/24/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 07/24/1985
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 07/24/1985
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/24/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 07/24/1985
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6] 07/24/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 07/24/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 07/24/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/24/1985
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 07/24/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/24/1985
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/24/1985
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 07/24/1985
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 07/24/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 07/24/1985
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 07/24/1985
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 07/24/1985
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/24/1985
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 07/24/1985
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 07/24/1985
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/24/1985
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 07/24/1985
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 07/24/1985
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 07/24/1985
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 07/24/1985
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/24/1985
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 07/24/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/24/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 07/24/1985
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/24/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 07/24/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 07/24/1985
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/24/1985
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 07/24/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 07/24/1985
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 07/24/1985
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 07/24/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/24/1985
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 07/24/1985
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 07/24/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 07/24/1985
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 07/24/1985
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 07/24/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/24/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/24/1985
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 07/24/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 07/24/1985
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 07/24/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 07/24/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/24/1985
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 07/31/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/31/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/31/1985
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/31/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 07/31/1985
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 07/31/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/31/1985
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 07/31/1985
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 07/31/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 07/31/1985
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/31/1985
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 07/31/1985
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/31/1985
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 09/12/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/12/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/08/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/08/1985
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 10/08/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 10/08/1985
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/08/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 10/08/1985
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1] 10/08/1985
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 10/08/1985
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 10/08/1985
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 10/08/1985
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 10/08/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 10/22/1985
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 10/22/1985
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/22/1985
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 10/22/1985
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 10/22/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 10/22/1985
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 12/04/1985
Rep. Grotberg, John E. [R-IL-14] 12/04/1985
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 12/04/1985
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 12/04/1985
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 12/04/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 12/04/1985
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 12/04/1985
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/16/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 04/16/1986
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/05/1986