Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 07/16/1985
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 07/16/1985
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12] 07/22/1985
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 07/22/1985
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1] 07/22/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/22/1985
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 07/22/1985
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 07/22/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 07/22/1985
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 07/22/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/22/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 07/22/1985
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 07/22/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/22/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 07/22/1985
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 07/22/1985
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/23/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/23/1985
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/25/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 07/25/1985
Rep. Long, Cathy (Mrs. Gillis) [D-LA-8] 07/25/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/25/1985
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 07/25/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 07/26/1985