Committees: H.R.3128 — 99th Congress (1985-1986)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and Labor07/31/1985 Referred to
09/11/1985 Markup by
09/11/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-241 Part 2
House Energy and Commerce07/31/1985 Referred to
09/11/1985 Discharged from
House Judiciary07/31/1985 Referred to
09/10/1985 Markup by
09/11/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-241 Part 3
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations09/05/1985 Referred to
09/10/1985 Markup by
09/10/1985 Reported by
House Ways and Means07/31/1985 Referred to
07/31/1985 Reported by H.Rept 99-241 Part 1
Senate Finance11/07/1985 Referred to
11/13/1985 Markup by
11/14/1985 Reported by