Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10]* 09/18/1985
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 09/18/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/18/1985
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 09/18/1985
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 09/18/1985
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 09/18/1985
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 09/18/1985
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 11/20/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 11/20/1985
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/20/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 11/20/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 11/20/1985
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/20/1985
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 11/20/1985
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 11/20/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 11/20/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 11/20/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/20/1985
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/20/1985
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 11/20/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 11/20/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 11/20/1985
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 02/05/1986
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 02/05/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 02/05/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/05/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 02/05/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 02/05/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/05/1986
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 02/05/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 02/05/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 02/05/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/05/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/05/1986
Rep. Zschau, Edwin V. W. [R-CA-12] 02/05/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 02/05/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 02/05/1986
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 02/05/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 02/05/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/11/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 09/23/1986