Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 09/26/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1]* 09/26/1985
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 09/26/1985
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 10/03/1985
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/05/1986
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 04/15/1986
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/13/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 06/23/1986
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 06/23/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/15/1986