Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 10/24/1985
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 10/24/1985
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 10/24/1985
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 10/24/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 10/24/1985
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 10/24/1985
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 10/24/1985
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 10/24/1985
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 10/24/1985
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14]* 10/24/1985
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 10/24/1985
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4]* 10/24/1985
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 10/24/1985
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/30/1985
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 10/30/1985
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 10/30/1985
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 11/01/1985
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/01/1985
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 11/01/1985
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 11/13/1985
Rep. Grotberg, John E. [R-IL-14] 11/20/1985
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 11/20/1985
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 11/20/1985
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 11/20/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 11/20/1985
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 11/20/1985
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 12/05/1985
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 12/05/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 12/05/1985
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 12/05/1985
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 12/05/1985
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 12/05/1985
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 12/05/1985
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 12/05/1985
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 12/05/1985
Rep. Franklin, William W. [R-MS-2] 12/05/1985
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 12/05/1985
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 12/05/1985
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 12/05/1985
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 12/05/1985
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 12/05/1985
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 12/05/1985
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 12/05/1985
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 12/05/1985
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 12/05/1985
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 12/10/1985
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 12/10/1985
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 12/10/1985
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 12/10/1985
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 12/10/1985
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 12/10/1985
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 12/10/1985
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 12/10/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 12/10/1985
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 12/10/1985
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 12/12/1985
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 12/12/1985
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 12/16/1985
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 12/16/1985
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 12/16/1985
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 12/16/1985
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 12/18/1985
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 12/18/1985
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 12/19/1985
Rep. Eckert, Fred J. [R-NY-30] 02/03/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 02/19/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 02/19/1986
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 03/11/1986
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/15/1986
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 05/08/1986
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 05/08/1986