Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to temporarily increase the limit on the public debt and to restore the investments of the Social Security Trust Funds and other trust funds.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/14/1985Became Public Law No: 99-155.
11/14/1985Signed by President.
11/14/1985Presented to President.
11/14/1985Resolving differences -- House actions: House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
11/13/1985Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/13/1985Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 300 - 121 (Record Vote No: 405).
11/12/1985Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
11/14/1985Became Public Law No: 99-155.
11/14/1985Signed by President.
11/14/1985HousePresented to President.
11/14/1985SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
11/14/1985HouseHouse Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
11/13/1985SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/13/1985SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
11/13/1985HousePassed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 300 - 121 (Record Vote No: 405).
11/13/1985HouseCalled up by House by Rule.
11/13/1985HouseRule Passed House.
11/13/1985SenateS.Amdt.1035 Amendment SP 1035 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
11/13/1985SenateS.Amdt.1035 Proposed by Senator Packwood. To temporarily increase the public debt limit, and to extend certain temporary provisions.
11/12/1985HouseOrdered to be Reported.
11/12/1985HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/12/1985HouseReferred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
11/12/1985HouseRules Committee Resolution H.Res.318 Reported to House.
11/12/1985HouseCommittee on Rules Granted a Rule Providing for Consideration in the House; Waiving all Points of Order Against Consideration of the Bill; Providing One Hour of Debate.
11/12/1985HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2]* 11/12/1985

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means11/12/1985 Referred to
11/12/1985 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3721. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/13/1985)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Increases the public debt limit until December 6, 1985, by an amount determined by the Secretary of the Treasury to be necessary to permit the United States to meet its obligations, but not in excess of $1,903,800,000,000. Directs the Secretary to restore to the Social Security Trust Funds and any other Government trust funds any securities disinvested since September 30, 1985.

Extends to December 14, 1985: (1) the increase in the excise tax on cigarettes; (2) the trade adjustment assistance program; (3) borrowing authority under the Railroad Unemployment Insurance Act; and (4) Medicare hospital and physician payments.