Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 12/02/1985
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 12/02/1985
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 12/02/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/04/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 02/05/1986
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 02/05/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 02/05/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 02/06/1986
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 02/18/1986
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 02/18/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/18/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 02/18/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 02/18/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 02/19/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 02/19/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 02/20/1986
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/20/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 03/05/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/06/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 03/13/1986
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 04/15/1986