Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 12/11/1985
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/11/1985
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 12/11/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 12/11/1985
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 12/11/1985
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 12/11/1985
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 12/11/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 12/11/1985
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 12/11/1985
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 02/18/1986
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 02/18/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/18/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 02/18/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 02/18/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 02/18/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 02/18/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 02/18/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 02/18/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 02/18/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 02/18/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 02/18/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/18/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 02/18/1986
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 02/18/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 02/18/1986
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/18/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 02/18/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 02/18/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 02/18/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 02/18/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 02/18/1986
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 02/18/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 02/18/1986
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/18/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/18/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 02/18/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/17/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/17/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/17/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/17/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/17/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/17/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/17/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/17/1986
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/17/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 03/17/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/17/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/17/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/08/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 04/08/1986
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 05/13/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/13/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/13/1986
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/13/1986
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 05/13/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/13/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/13/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 05/13/1986
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 05/13/1986
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 05/13/1986
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/13/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/13/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/13/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/13/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/13/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/13/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/13/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/13/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/13/1986
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 06/23/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 06/23/1986
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/23/1986
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 06/23/1986