Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 03/06/1986
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/06/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/06/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/06/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 03/06/1986
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/06/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/06/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 03/06/1986
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 03/06/1986
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/06/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 03/06/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/06/1986
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 03/06/1986
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 03/06/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 03/06/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/06/1986
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/06/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 03/06/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/06/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/06/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/06/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 03/06/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/06/1986
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/06/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/06/1986
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 03/18/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/18/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/18/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/18/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 03/18/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 03/21/1986
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/21/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/21/1986
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 03/21/1986
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/21/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/21/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 03/21/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/21/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/13/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/13/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/03/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/03/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 06/03/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 06/03/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 06/03/1986
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 06/03/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/03/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 06/03/1986
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 06/03/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 06/09/1986
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 06/09/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 06/23/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 06/25/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/25/1986
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 07/16/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 08/04/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 09/09/1986