Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 02/18/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 02/18/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 02/18/1986
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 02/18/1986
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 02/18/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 02/18/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/18/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 02/18/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 02/18/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 02/18/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/18/1986
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 02/18/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 02/18/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 02/18/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/26/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 02/26/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 02/26/1986
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12] 02/26/1986
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 02/26/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 02/26/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 02/26/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/26/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 02/26/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/26/1986
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/26/1986
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 02/26/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 02/26/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/26/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 02/26/1986
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/04/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 03/04/1986
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 03/04/1986
Rep. Long, Cathy (Mrs. Gillis) [D-LA-8] 03/04/1986
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 03/11/1986
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 03/11/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/11/1986
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/11/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/11/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/11/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/11/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 03/13/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/13/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/13/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/13/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 03/13/1986
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/13/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 03/18/1986
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 03/18/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/18/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/18/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 03/18/1986
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 03/18/1986
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 03/18/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 04/08/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/08/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/08/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/08/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/08/1986
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/08/1986
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/08/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/08/1986
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 04/08/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/08/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/09/1986
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 04/09/1986
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 04/09/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/09/1986
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/09/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 04/09/1986
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/09/1986
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/09/1986
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/09/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 04/09/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/09/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 04/09/1986
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/09/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 04/28/1986
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 04/28/1986
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4] 04/28/1986
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/28/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/07/1986
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/07/1986
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 05/07/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/07/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 05/07/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 05/07/1986
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/07/1986
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/07/1986
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 05/19/1986
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/19/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/19/1986
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 05/19/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/19/1986
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 05/19/1986
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 06/03/1986
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5] 06/03/1986
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7] 06/03/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 06/03/1986
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 06/09/1986
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/09/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 06/23/1986
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/23/1986
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/23/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/23/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/16/1986
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 07/16/1986
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 07/16/1986
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 07/16/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 07/16/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 07/16/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/30/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/30/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/1986
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21] 09/23/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 09/23/1986
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 09/23/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/23/1986
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 10/10/1986