Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/22/1986
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 01/22/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/22/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 01/30/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 01/30/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 01/30/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 01/30/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 01/30/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 01/30/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 01/30/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 01/30/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 01/30/1986
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 01/30/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 01/30/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 01/30/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 01/30/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 01/30/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 01/30/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/30/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 01/30/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 01/30/1986
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/30/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 01/30/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 02/03/1986
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 02/03/1986
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 02/03/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 02/03/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/03/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 02/03/1986
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 02/03/1986
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/03/1986
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 02/05/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 02/05/1986
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/05/1986
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/05/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 02/05/1986
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 02/05/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/05/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 02/18/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 02/18/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/18/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 02/18/1986
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/18/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 02/18/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/18/1986
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 02/18/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 02/25/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/25/1986
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 02/26/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 02/27/1986
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 02/27/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 03/11/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 03/18/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/08/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 07/15/1986
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 09/16/1986