Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1954 to deny the benefits of section 911 of such Code to individuals who are in a foreign country in violation of an Executive order.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/27/1986Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/19/1986Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Select Revenue Measures
03/20/1986Referred to Subcommittee on Select Revenue Measures.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/27/1986Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/27/1986Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/26/1986
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 02/26/1986
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 02/26/1986
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42]* 02/26/1986
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 02/26/1986
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/27/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 02/27/1986
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 02/27/1986
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 02/27/1986
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/13/1986
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 03/13/1986
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 03/13/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/13/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/13/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 03/13/1986
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/13/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 03/25/1986
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 06/25/1986

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/27/1986 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Select Revenue Measures03/20/1986 Referred to
05/19/1986 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4056.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4056. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/27/1986)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to provide that citizens or residents of the United States who are in a foreign country in violation of an executive order shall not be permitted to exclude from income the foreign earned income from sources within such country or the housing expenses allocable for housing in such country.