Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 02/03/1986
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 02/03/1986
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 02/03/1986
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3]* 02/03/1986
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/05/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/05/1986
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 02/05/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 02/05/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 02/05/1986
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/05/1986
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/05/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 02/05/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 02/05/1986
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 02/18/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/18/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 02/18/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 02/24/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 02/24/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/24/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 02/24/1986
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/24/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 02/24/1986
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 02/24/1986
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 02/24/1986
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 02/24/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 02/24/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 02/24/1986
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/03/1986
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 03/03/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/03/1986
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/03/1986
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 03/03/1986
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 03/03/1986
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/10/1986
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 03/10/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 03/10/1986
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/10/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/17/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/17/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 03/17/1986
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 03/17/1986
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/17/1986
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 03/17/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/17/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 03/17/1986
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 03/17/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/17/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/17/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/25/1986
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 03/25/1986
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/25/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/25/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 03/25/1986
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/25/1986
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 03/25/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/25/1986
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 03/25/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/25/1986
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3] 03/25/1986
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 04/15/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 04/15/1986
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 04/15/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 04/15/1986
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 04/15/1986
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 04/15/1986
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/15/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/15/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/15/1986
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 04/15/1986
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/12/1986
Rep. Sweeney, David McCann [R-TX-14] 05/12/1986
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 05/12/1986
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 05/12/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 05/12/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 05/12/1986
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/12/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/12/1986
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/12/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 05/12/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 05/12/1986
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 05/12/1986
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 05/19/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/19/1986
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 05/19/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/19/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 05/19/1986
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 05/19/1986
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 05/19/1986
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 05/19/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/19/1986
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/19/1986
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 05/19/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/03/1986
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/03/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 06/03/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/03/1986
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/03/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 06/03/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 06/03/1986
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 06/03/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/16/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/16/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 06/16/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 06/16/1986
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 06/16/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/16/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/16/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/16/1986
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 07/16/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 07/16/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 07/16/1986
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 07/16/1986
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 07/16/1986
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 07/16/1986
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 07/16/1986
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 07/16/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 07/28/1986
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 07/28/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 07/28/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/07/1986
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 09/08/1986
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21] 09/24/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 09/24/1986
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 09/24/1986