Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 01/29/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 01/29/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/29/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 02/05/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 02/05/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 02/05/1986
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 02/24/1986
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 02/24/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 02/24/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 02/24/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/24/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 02/24/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 02/24/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/24/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 02/24/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/24/1986
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 02/24/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 02/24/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 02/24/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 02/24/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/24/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 02/24/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 02/26/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/26/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/13/1986
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/13/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/09/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/09/1986
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 04/09/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/09/1986
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 04/09/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 04/16/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/16/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 04/16/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/16/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 04/16/1986
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 04/16/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 04/22/1986
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/22/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 04/22/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/22/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/06/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/06/1986
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 05/06/1986
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4] 05/06/1986
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 05/06/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/06/1986
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/13/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 05/13/1986
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/18/1986
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/25/1986
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 07/15/1986
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 07/15/1986
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/15/1986