Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to establish, for the purpose of implementing any order issued by the President for fiscal year 1986 under any law providing for sequestration of new loan guarantee commitments, a guaranteed loan limitation amount applicable to chapter 37 of title 38, United States Code, for fiscal year 1986.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
03/07/1986Became Public Law No: 99-255.
03/07/1986Signed by President.
02/27/1986Presented to President.
02/25/1986Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
02/25/1986Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 386 - 0 (Record Vote No: 27).
02/20/1986Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 99-472.
02/05/1986Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
03/07/1986Became Public Law No: 99-255.
03/07/1986Signed by President.
02/27/1986HousePresented to President.
02/27/1986SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
02/25/1986SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
02/25/1986HousePassed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 386 - 0 (Record Vote No: 27).
02/25/1986HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
02/20/1986HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 278.
02/20/1986HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 99-472.
02/05/1986HouseReferred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/05/1986HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/05/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 02/05/1986
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 02/05/1986
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 02/20/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 02/20/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 02/20/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/20/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/20/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/20/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/20/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 02/20/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 02/20/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/20/1986
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 02/20/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 02/20/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 02/20/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 02/20/1986
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/20/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/20/1986
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 02/20/1986
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/20/1986
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 02/20/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/20/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 02/20/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 02/20/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/20/1986
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 02/20/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/20/1986
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 02/20/1986
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 02/20/1986
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 02/20/1986
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5] 02/20/1986
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 02/20/1986
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 02/20/1986
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/20/1986
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/20/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/20/1986
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 02/20/1986
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 02/20/1986
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 02/20/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 02/20/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 02/20/1986
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/20/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 02/20/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 02/20/1986
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 02/20/1986

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/05/1986 Referred to
02/20/1986 Reported by H.Rept 99-472

No related bill information was received for H.R.4130.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4130. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (02/25/1986)

(Measure passed House, amended, roll call #27 (386-0))

Establishes a veterans' home loan guaranty limitation amount of $18,200,000,000 reduced by 4.3 percent for purposes of implementing any sequestration order issued by the President for FY 1986 calling for a reduction of such loan commitments.