Committees: H.R.4136 — 99th Congress (1985-1986)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/06/1986 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Seapower and Strategic and Critical Materials02/14/1986 Referred to
03/04/1986 Hearings by
05/08/1986 Markup by
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries02/06/1986 Referred to
06/04/1986 Markup by
08/15/1986 Reported by H.Rept 99-795 Part 1
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine02/13/1986 Referred to
03/11/1986 Hearings by
04/10/1986 Markup by
04/10/1986 Reported by