Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-4]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 03/11/1986
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 03/11/1986
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/21/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 03/21/1986
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 03/21/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 03/21/1986
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 03/21/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/21/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 03/21/1986
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 03/21/1986
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 03/21/1986
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 03/21/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/15/1986
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/15/1986
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 04/15/1986
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 04/15/1986
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/15/1986
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 04/15/1986
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/15/1986
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 04/15/1986
Rep. Evans, Cooper [R-IA-3] 04/15/1986
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 04/15/1986
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 04/15/1986
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/15/1986
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 04/15/1986
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/22/1986
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 04/22/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/22/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/22/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/22/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 04/22/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/22/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/22/1986
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/22/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/22/1986
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 04/22/1986
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 04/22/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 04/22/1986
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 04/22/1986
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/22/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 04/22/1986
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 04/22/1986
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/22/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/22/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 04/22/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 04/22/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 04/24/1986
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 04/24/1986
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/24/1986
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 04/24/1986
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 04/24/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 04/24/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 04/24/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 04/24/1986
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/24/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 04/24/1986
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 07/23/1986
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 07/23/1986
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/23/1986
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1] 07/23/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/23/1986
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/23/1986
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 07/23/1986
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 07/23/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 07/23/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 07/23/1986
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 07/23/1986
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/23/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/23/1986
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 07/23/1986
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 08/01/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 08/01/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 08/01/1986
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/01/1986
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 08/01/1986
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 08/01/1986
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 08/01/1986
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5] 08/01/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 08/01/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 08/01/1986
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/01/1986
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 08/01/1986
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 08/01/1986
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 08/01/1986
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 08/05/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 08/05/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 08/05/1986
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 08/05/1986
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 08/05/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 08/05/1986
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 08/05/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/05/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 08/05/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 08/05/1986
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 08/05/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/05/1986
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 08/07/1986
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 08/07/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 08/07/1986
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 08/07/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 08/07/1986
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 08/07/1986
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 08/07/1986
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 08/07/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 08/07/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 08/07/1986
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 08/07/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 08/07/1986
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 08/15/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 08/15/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/15/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 08/15/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 08/15/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/15/1986
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 08/15/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/15/1986
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/15/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 08/15/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 08/15/1986
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 08/15/1986
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 09/16/1986
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 09/16/1986
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 09/16/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 09/16/1986
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/24/1986
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 09/24/1986