Committees: H.R.4260 — 99th Congress (1985-1986)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business02/26/1986 Referred to
06/11/1986 Markup by
06/18/1986 Reported by H.Rept 99-646
House Small Business Subcommittee on General Oversight and the Economy05/08/1986 Referred to
05/15/1986 Hearings by
05/22/1986 Markup by
05/22/1986 Reported by
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)06/19/1986 Referred to
07/17/1986 Markup by
07/17/1986 Reported by H.Rept 99-646 Part 2
House Armed Services06/19/1986 Referred to
08/01/1986 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs06/19/1986 Referred to
08/01/1986 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce06/19/1986 Referred to
08/01/1986 Reported by H.Rept 99-646 Part 4
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment06/26/1986 Referred to
07/29/1986 Discharged from
House Science and Technology06/19/1986 Referred to
07/29/1986 Markup by
08/01/1986 Reported by H.Rept 99-646 Part 3
House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Science, Research and Technology07/02/1986 Referred to
07/16/1986 Hearings by
07/22/1986 Markup by
07/22/1986 Reported by
House Veterans' Affairs06/19/1986 Referred to
08/01/1986 Discharged from