Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Dwight David Eisenhower Centennial Commission Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to establish a commission for the purpose of encouraging and providing for the commemoration of the centennial of the birth of President Dwight David Eisenhower.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
11/07/1986Became Public Law No: 99-624.
11/07/1986Signed by President.
10/30/1986Presented to President.
10/18/1986Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/23/1986Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/18/1986Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. Report No: 99-842.
03/04/1986Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/07/1986Became Public Law No: 99-624.
11/07/1986Signed by President.
10/30/1986HousePresented to President.
10/29/1986SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/18/1986SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/29/1986SenateHeld at the desk by unanimous consent. Pending further disposition.
09/25/1986SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/23/1986HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/23/1986HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
09/18/1986HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 508.
09/18/1986HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. Report No: 99-842.
09/16/1986HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
09/16/1986HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
08/07/1986HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population
08/07/1986HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population
08/07/1986HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population
08/06/1986HouseExecutive Comment Received From US Postal Service.
07/24/1986HouseExecutive Comment Requested from OMB, US Postal Service.
03/11/1986HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
03/04/1986HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
03/04/1986HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (21)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service03/04/1986 Referred to
09/16/1986 Markup by
09/18/1986 Reported by H.Rept 99-842
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Census and Population03/11/1986 Referred to
08/07/1986 Hearings by
08/07/1986 Markup by
08/07/1986 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4302.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4302. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/23/1986)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Establishes the Dwight David Eisenhower Centennial Commission to: (1) encourage, plan, and coordinate the centennial of the birth of former President Dwight David Eisenhower; and (2) submit recommendations to the Congress regarding a joint meeting of the Congress to commemorate such centennial. Requires annual Commission reports to the Congress and the President.

Permits any donated material to be deposited in the Dwight D. Eisenhower Library or disposed of by the Commission in consultation with the Librarian of Congress and the Secretary of the Smithsonian Institution.

Authorizes appropriations.