Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 03/11/1986
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 03/11/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/13/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 03/13/1986
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/13/1986
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 03/13/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/13/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/13/1986
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/13/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/13/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/13/1986
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 03/13/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/13/1986
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 03/13/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 03/13/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 03/13/1986
Rep. Eckert, Fred J. [R-NY-30] 03/13/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/13/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/13/1986
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 03/13/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 03/13/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/13/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/13/1986
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/13/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 03/13/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 03/13/1986
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 03/13/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/13/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/13/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/13/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/06/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/06/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/06/1986
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 05/06/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/06/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/06/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 05/06/1986
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/04/1986
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 06/04/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 06/04/1986
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 07/21/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 07/21/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/21/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 07/21/1986
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/21/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 07/21/1986
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 07/21/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 07/21/1986
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 07/21/1986
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 07/21/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 07/21/1986
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 07/21/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 07/21/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/21/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 07/21/1986
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 07/21/1986