Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 03/12/1986
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 03/12/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 03/12/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 04/21/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 04/21/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/21/1986
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 04/21/1986
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 04/21/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/21/1986
Rep. Franklin, William W. [R-MS-2] 04/21/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/21/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/21/1986
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/21/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/21/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 04/21/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/21/1986
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 04/21/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 04/21/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 04/21/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/21/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/21/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 04/21/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 04/21/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 04/29/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 04/29/1986
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 04/29/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/29/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/29/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 04/29/1986
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 04/29/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/29/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/29/1986
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 04/29/1986
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/29/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/29/1986
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 04/29/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/29/1986
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/29/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 04/29/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/29/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/08/1986
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 05/08/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/08/1986
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 05/08/1986
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 05/08/1986
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 05/08/1986
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/08/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/08/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/08/1986
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5] 05/08/1986
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 05/08/1986
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 05/08/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 05/08/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/08/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/08/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/08/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 05/08/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/08/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/08/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/04/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 06/04/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 06/04/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 06/04/1986
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 06/04/1986
Rep. Hendon, Bill [R-NC-11] 06/04/1986
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 06/04/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 06/04/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/04/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/04/1986
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 06/04/1986
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/04/1986
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/04/1986
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/04/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/04/1986
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 06/04/1986
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 06/04/1986
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 06/04/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/04/1986
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 06/04/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/04/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 06/04/1986
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 06/04/1986
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 07/15/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/15/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/15/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/15/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 07/15/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/15/1986
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 07/15/1986
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 07/15/1986
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 07/15/1986
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 07/15/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 08/06/1986
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 08/06/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/06/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 08/06/1986
Rep. McCain, John [R-AZ-1] 08/06/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 08/06/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 08/06/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/06/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 08/06/1986