Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10]* 04/17/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/29/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/29/1986
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 04/29/1986
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 04/29/1986
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 04/30/1986
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 04/30/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/30/1986
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 05/06/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/06/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/06/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/06/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/08/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/08/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 05/08/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/08/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/08/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 05/08/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/08/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 05/08/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/08/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/08/1986
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/13/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/13/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/13/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 05/13/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/13/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 05/13/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/13/1986
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/13/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/13/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/13/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 05/20/1986
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 05/20/1986
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/20/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/20/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 05/20/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/20/1986
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 06/04/1986
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 06/04/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/04/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/04/1986
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 06/11/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/11/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/11/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/11/1986
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 06/26/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 06/26/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/16/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/16/1986
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 07/16/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/16/1986