Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Eckert, Fred J. [R-NY-30]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 04/10/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 04/10/1986
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Long, Cathy (Mrs. Gillis) [D-LA-8]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34]* 04/10/1986
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 04/10/1986
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 04/10/1986
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 04/10/1986
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 04/10/1986
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 04/10/1986
Rep. McKernan, John R., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 04/10/1986
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 04/10/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/21/1986
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 04/21/1986
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 04/21/1986
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/29/1986
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/29/1986
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 05/06/1986
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 05/06/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 05/13/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 05/19/1986
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 05/22/1986
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/09/1986
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 06/17/1986
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 06/17/1986
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/23/1986
Rep. Zschau, Edwin V. W. [R-CA-12] 06/25/1986
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 07/14/1986
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7] 07/16/1986
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 07/16/1986
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 07/21/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 07/23/1986
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/31/1986
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 08/08/1986
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 08/15/1986

Show cosponsors who withdrew