Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 06/18/1986
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 07/14/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/14/1986
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 07/14/1986
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/14/1986
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/14/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/14/1986
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 07/14/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/14/1986
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 07/14/1986
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/14/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/14/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 07/14/1986
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/14/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 07/14/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 07/14/1986
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 07/16/1986
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/16/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14] 07/16/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5] 07/16/1986
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/16/1986
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/16/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/16/1986
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/16/1986
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 07/17/1986
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 07/17/1986
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 07/17/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/17/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/17/1986
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 07/17/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/17/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 07/17/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/17/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 07/17/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/17/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 07/17/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/17/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/17/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/17/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 07/17/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/21/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/21/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 07/21/1986
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 07/21/1986
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/21/1986
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 07/21/1986
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 07/21/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 07/21/1986
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/21/1986
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/21/1986
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/21/1986
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/21/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 07/21/1986
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/21/1986
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 07/21/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 07/21/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 07/21/1986
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 07/21/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/22/1986
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 07/22/1986
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/22/1986
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 07/22/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 07/23/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/23/1986
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 07/23/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 07/23/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/23/1986
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 07/23/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 07/23/1986
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/23/1986
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5] 07/23/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 07/23/1986
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 07/23/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 07/23/1986
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/23/1986
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 07/23/1986
Rep. Reid, Harry [D-NV-1] 07/23/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 07/24/1986
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 07/24/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/24/1986
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 07/24/1986
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 07/24/1986
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/24/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/24/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/28/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 07/28/1986
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 07/28/1986
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/28/1986
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 07/28/1986
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/28/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/28/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 07/28/1986
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/28/1986
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/28/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/28/1986
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/29/1986
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 07/29/1986
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 07/29/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/29/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 07/30/1986
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 07/30/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 07/30/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 07/30/1986
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 07/30/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/30/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 07/30/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 07/31/1986
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 07/31/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 07/31/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 07/31/1986
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 07/31/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 07/31/1986
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/31/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/31/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 08/08/1986
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 08/08/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 08/08/1986
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 08/08/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/08/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 08/08/1986
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 08/08/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 08/08/1986
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 08/08/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 08/08/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 08/12/1986
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 08/12/1986
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 08/12/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/08/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 09/08/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/08/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/08/1986
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 09/08/1986
Rep. Long, Cathy (Mrs. Gillis) [D-LA-8] 09/08/1986
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 09/11/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/11/1986
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/11/1986
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 09/11/1986
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 09/24/1986
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 09/24/1986
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 10/08/1986