Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 05/13/1986
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 05/13/1986
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Strang, Michael L. [R-CO-3]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2]* 05/13/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 05/15/1986
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/15/1986
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 05/15/1986
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/15/1986
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 05/15/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/15/1986
Rep. Monson, David S. [R-UT-2] 05/15/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 05/15/1986
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4] 05/15/1986
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 05/15/1986
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 05/21/1986
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 05/21/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/21/1986
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/21/1986
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/21/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/21/1986
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 05/21/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/21/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/03/1986
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/03/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 06/03/1986
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 06/03/1986
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/03/1986
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 06/03/1986
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/03/1986
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 06/03/1986
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/03/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 06/04/1986
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 06/04/1986
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 06/04/1986
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 06/04/1986
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/10/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/10/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/10/1986
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/10/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 06/10/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 06/10/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/11/1986
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 06/11/1986
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/11/1986
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/12/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/12/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/12/1986
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/12/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/19/1986
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/19/1986
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 06/25/1986
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 07/15/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 07/16/1986
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 07/22/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/24/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/31/1986
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 08/05/1986
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 08/05/1986
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 08/11/1986
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/13/1986