Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-6]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 01/31/1985
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42]* 01/31/1985
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 01/31/1985
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 01/31/1985
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/07/1985
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 02/07/1985
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/07/1985
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 02/07/1985
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-2] 02/07/1985
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 02/07/1985
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 02/07/1985
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 02/07/1985
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 02/07/1985
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 02/07/1985
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 02/07/1985
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 02/07/1985
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/07/1985
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/07/1985
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 02/07/1985
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/07/1985
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/07/1985
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 02/07/1985
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/07/1985
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 02/07/1985
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 02/07/1985
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 02/19/1985
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/19/1985
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 02/19/1985
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 02/19/1985
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/19/1985
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 02/19/1985
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/19/1985
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 02/19/1985
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 02/19/1985
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 02/19/1985
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 02/19/1985
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 02/19/1985
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/19/1985
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/19/1985
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 02/19/1985
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 02/19/1985
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/19/1985
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 02/19/1985
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 02/19/1985
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/19/1985
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/19/1985
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 02/19/1985
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/25/1985
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 02/25/1985
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 02/25/1985
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/25/1985
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 02/25/1985
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 02/25/1985
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 02/26/1985
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 02/26/1985
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 02/26/1985
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 03/04/1985
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 03/04/1985
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 03/04/1985
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/04/1985
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 03/04/1985
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/04/1985
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 03/04/1985
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 03/04/1985
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/04/1985
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 03/04/1985
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 03/04/1985
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 03/04/1985
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/04/1985
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/04/1985
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/04/1985
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 03/04/1985
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/04/1985
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 03/04/1985
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/04/1985
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/04/1985
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/04/1985
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 03/04/1985
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 03/04/1985
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 03/04/1985
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 03/04/1985
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 03/04/1985
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/04/1985
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/05/1985
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 03/05/1985
Rep. Evans, Cooper [R-IA-3] 03/05/1985