Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Computer Fraud and Abuse Act of 1986

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Computer Fraud and Abuse Act of 1986

Short Titles as Reported to House

Computer Fraud and Abuse Act of 1986

Short Titles as Introduced

Computer Fraud and Abuse Act of 1986

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Computer Fraud and Abuse Act of 1986

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to provide additional penalties for fraud and related activities in connection with access devices and computers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
10/16/1986 Became Public Law No: 99-474.
10/16/1986 Signed by President.
10/08/1986 Presented to President.
10/06/1986 Resolving differences -- House actions: House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/1986 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/03/1986 Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged.
06/03/1986 Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/22/1986 Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 99-612.
04/30/1986 Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
10/16/1986 Became Public Law No: 99-474.
10/16/1986 Signed by President.
10/08/1986 House Presented to President.
10/08/1986 Senate Measure Signed in Senate.
10/06/1986 House House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/1986 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/03/1986 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
10/03/1986 Senate Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged.
10/03/1986 Senate S.Amdt.3213 Amendment SP 3213 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/03/1986 Senate S.Amdt.3213 Proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator Trible. In the nature of a substitute.
06/04/1986 Senate Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
06/03/1986 House Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/03/1986 House Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
05/22/1986 House Placed on Union Calendar No: 357.
05/22/1986 House Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 99-612.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/06/1986 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/06/1986 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/30/1986 House For Previous Action See H.R.4562.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/30/1986 House Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
04/30/1986 House Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/30/1986 Referred to
05/06/1986 Markup by
05/22/1986 Reported by H.Rept 99-612
Senate Judiciary06/04/1986 Referred to
10/03/1986 Discharged from

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (15)

  • Civil Rights and Liberties
  • Computer crimes
  • Computers
  • Computers and government
  • Conspiracy
  • Crime prevention
  • Electronic funds transfers
  • Fines (Penalties)
  • Fraud
  • Larceny
  • Right of privacy
  • Science and technology
  • White collar crime

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4718. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/03/1986)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Computer Fraud and Abuse Act of 1986 - Amends the Federal criminal code to change the scienter requirement from "knowingly" to "intentionally" for certain offenses regarding accessing the computer files of another.

Revises the definition of "financial institution" to which the financial record provisions of computer fraud law apply. Applies such provisions to any financial records (including those of corporations and small businesses), not just those of individuals and certain partnerships.

Modifies existing Federal law regarding accessing Federal computers. Makes the basic offense trespass. Removes criminal liability for exceeding (without the intent to defraud) authorized access to a Federal computer in one's own department or agency.

Creates new Federal criminal offenses of: (1) property theft by computer occurring as part of a scheme to defraud; (2) altering, damaging, or destroying information in, or preventing the authorized use of, a Federal interest computer; and (3) trafficking in computer access passwords.

Eliminates the special conspiracy provisions for computer crimes. (Such conspiracies shall be treated under the general Federal conspiracy statutes.)

Amends penalty provisions to remove the cap on fines for certain computer crimes.

Exempts authorized law enforcement or intelligence activities.