Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend section 9528 of the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 to hold States harmless, during fiscal year 1987, against a decrease in payment rates under the medicaid program resulting from enactment of that section.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/21/1986Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/05/1986Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/21/1986Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/1986Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA-5]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large]* 05/21/1986
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 05/22/1986
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8] 05/22/1986
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 06/04/1986
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 06/04/1986
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 06/04/1986
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 06/04/1986
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/04/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/04/1986
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/04/1986
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/12/1986
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/12/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/12/1986
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/17/1986
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 06/17/1986
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 06/17/1986
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 06/24/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/24/1986
Rep. Cobey, William W. [R-NC-4] 06/24/1986
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/24/1986
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 06/24/1986
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/25/1986
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/15/1986
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/15/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 07/15/1986
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 07/15/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/15/1986
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 07/15/1986
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 07/15/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/16/1986
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 07/16/1986
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 07/16/1986
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 07/16/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 07/16/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 07/22/1986
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/22/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 07/22/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/24/1986
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 07/30/1986

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/21/1986 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment06/05/1986 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4876.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4876. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/21/1986)

Amends the Consolidated Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 to hold a State harmless in FY 1987 against changes that Act effected in the annual calculation of the Federal medical assistance percentage under title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act if such changes would cause a reduction of Medicaid payments to the State in FY 1987.