Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 06/04/1986
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Burton, Sala [D-CA-5]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 06/04/1986
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 06/05/1986
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 06/05/1986
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/05/1986
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/05/1986
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/05/1986
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-At Large] 06/05/1986
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 06/05/1986
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 06/05/1986
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/05/1986
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 06/05/1986
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 06/05/1986
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 06/05/1986
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/05/1986
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 06/05/1986
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/05/1986
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 06/05/1986
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 06/05/1986
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/05/1986
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/05/1986
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 06/05/1986
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 06/05/1986
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 06/05/1986
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/05/1986
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 06/05/1986
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/05/1986
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 06/05/1986
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 06/05/1986
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 06/05/1986
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/05/1986
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/05/1986
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/05/1986
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 06/05/1986
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/05/1986
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/05/1986
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/05/1986
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/12/1986
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 06/12/1986
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 06/12/1986
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 06/12/1986
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 06/12/1986
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 06/12/1986
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 06/12/1986
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/12/1986
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/12/1986
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/12/1986
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/12/1986
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 06/12/1986
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 06/12/1986
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/12/1986
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 06/12/1986
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 06/12/1986
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 06/12/1986
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/12/1986
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 06/12/1986
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 06/12/1986
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 06/12/1986
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/12/1986
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/12/1986
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-34] 06/12/1986
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/12/1986
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/12/1986
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/12/1986
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/12/1986
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/12/1986
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 06/12/1986
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/12/1986
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/12/1986
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/12/1986
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 06/12/1986
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/12/1986
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/12/1986
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/12/1986
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 06/12/1986
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/12/1986
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 06/12/1986
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/12/1986
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 06/12/1986
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12] 06/12/1986
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 06/12/1986
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 06/12/1986
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 06/26/1986
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 06/26/1986
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/26/1986
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/26/1986
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/26/1986
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/26/1986
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/26/1986
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/26/1986
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/26/1986
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/26/1986
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/26/1986
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/26/1986
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 06/26/1986
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/26/1986
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/26/1986
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/26/1986
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 08/05/1986
Rep. Long, Cathy (Mrs. Gillis) [D-LA-8] 08/05/1986
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 08/05/1986
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 08/05/1986
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/05/1986
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 08/05/1986